THE CHINGFORD SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (C.S.P.A.)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for school purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 26 July 1995: Standard registration
- CHINGFORD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith David Taylor | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91k | £1.65k | £2.26k | £739 | £446 | |
|
Total expenditure | £761 | £3.76k | £637 | £688 | £123 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 340 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 340 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 706 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 706 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1985 (AS AMENDED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1994)
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
CHINFORD, WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Frances Road
Chingford
London
E4 9DH
- Phone:
- 02085273559
- Email:
- cfspa@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window