Whitby School Charitable Fund

Charity Number: 1048288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational/enrichment activities for young people and fundraising by students for other charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £50,123
Total expenditure: £108,994

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1995: Standard registration
  • 08 January 2015: Funds received from 1049894 CAEDMON SCHOOL FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CAEDMON COLLEGE WHITBY - PRIVATE FUND (Previous name)
  • WHITBY COMMUNITY COLLEGE PRIVATE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Taylor Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Sally Nedley Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Ms J Hunter Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £343.66k £17.15k £56.20k £476.11k £50.12k
Total expenditure £434.84k £25.81k £27.83k £327.83k £108.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WHITBY SCHOOL
PROSPECT HILL
WHITBY
YO21 1LA
Phone:
01947 601901