ST OLAVE'S PAROCHIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1048292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious and other charitable work in the parish of Central Exeter and specifically of St Olaves Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,707
Total expenditure: £6,220

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Betsy Allen Trustee 17 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER ST STEPHEN THE ERNEST AND WINIFRED BROOK GIFT
Received: On time
PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER (ST KERRIAN) TRUST
Received: On time
Keith Walton Trustee 16 July 2014
PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER ST STEPHEN THE ERNEST AND WINIFRED BROOK GIFT
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER (ST KERRIAN) TRUST
Received: On time
SUSAN FLORENCE BLOW Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CENTRAL EXETER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.01k £9.65k £10.18k £11.83k £12.71k
Total expenditure £7.58k £19.70k £7.19k £6.20k £6.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WHINFIELD HOUSE
CLYST HONITON
EXETER
EX5 2NE
Phone:
01392364836