WARRINER SCHOOL FARM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is established to provide support to the educational work of the Warriner School Farm being part of the Warriner Multi Academy Trust, Bloxham Oxfordshire. The Charity aims to raise money to make grants to the farm for specific purposes. It also leases land which it makes available to the Farm. The Farm provides educational service in conservation, agriculture and animal care locally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 27 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANNABEL KAY | Chair | 08 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alison Emily Lindsay | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gardiner | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Peissel | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Nicolson Lowe | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.52k | £1.99k | £5.07k | £9.26k | £7.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.18k | £3.20k | £3.20k | £5.72k | £9.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER EDUCATION IN AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND ALLIED SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WARRINER SCHOOL
BLOXHAM
BANBURY
OX15 4LJ
- Phone:
- 01295720777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window