SHRI DURGA BHAWAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhancement of welfare, educational, cultural and religious activities of hindus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 27 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pardeep Sharma Mr | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nitesh Mehan | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meena Mehan | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.24k | £30.77k | £21.78k | £5.86k | £27.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.03k | £30.34k | £26.34k | £18.18k | £22.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 358 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 358 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JUL 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Wellington Road
BILSTON
WV14 6BQ
- Phone:
- 07816715866
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window