FRIENDS OF NACHALAT OSHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1048311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

No change

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £134,817
Total expenditure: £133,850

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Meir Zev Rapoport Trustee 18 September 2016
None on record
MICHAEL M GRUN Trustee 22 December 2011
None on record
Rev YEHOSHUA KARLINSKY Trustee 22 December 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £211.73k £100.80k £109.35k £119.75k £134.82k
Total expenditure £235.93k £100.19k £100.02k £127.95k £133.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 July 2021 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 July 2021 155 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
97 STAMFORD HILL
LONDON
N16 5RB
Phone:
02088006688
Website:

No information available