SINGLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LETTING OF VILLAGE HALL TO GUIDES, BROWNIES, MARTIAL ARTS GROUPS, KEEP FIT CLASS, AMATEUR DRAMATICS GROUP, CHURCH, AND VARIOUS OTHER USES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 01 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOFF DARVILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stuart Tanton | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aime-Jane Dawson | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE BEERENSSON | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM GREGORY WIFFEN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Ian McClintock | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.33k | £54.93k | £75.09k | £68.21k | £90.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.73k | £49.41k | £57.31k | £48.31k | £98.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.28k | £16.00k | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED MADE 31ST MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GREAT CHART WITH SINGLETON AND ANY ADJOINING PARISH IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREAT CHART WITH SINGLETON AND ANY ADJOINING PARISH IN THE COUNTY OF KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 REEDMACE CLOSE
ASHFORD
TN23 5GE
- Phone:
- 01233642357
- Email:
- singletonvh@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window