THE ORDERS OF ST JOHN CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1048355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide care to older people through care homes specialising in residential, dementia and nursing care, together with intermediate and day care. Care in the community is also provided in hospitals, at home and through the provision of extra care housing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 2001: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 09 February 2017: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ORDERS OF ST JOHN TRUST CARE HOMES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher George Roffe-Silvester Trustee 06 February 2025
None on record
Dr Rekha Elaswarapu Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Johannes Franciscus Maria Grefte Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Mark Brenninmeyer Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Dr Anton Raymond Borg Trustee 12 July 2022
None on record
Richard Francis Bryden Milligan-Manby Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
James Kneller Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Mark Andrew Everall Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Major James Justin Macnamara TD VR JP Trustee 06 November 2019
QUEEN MARY'S ROEHAMPTON TRUST
Received: On time
DR RADCLIFFE'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WESTMINSTER DRAGOONS REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE ELLEN MACNAMARA MEMORIAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BERKSHIRE YEOMANRY MUSEUM CIO
Received: On time
Timothy John Edward Church Trustee 19 September 2018
None on record
Dr Anne de Bono Trustee 07 November 2017
None on record
GRAHAM STUART HUTTON Trustee 11 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £137.27m £142.61m £142.81m £146.84m £169.12m
Total expenditure £135.57m £143.41m £141.63m £151.06m £166.90m
Income from government contracts £63.92m £65.96m £66.98m £73.65m £84.44m
Income from government grants £6.67k £9.99m £6.87m £291.29k £656.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £200.23k £1.23m £1.86m £821.00k £1.04m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £135.45m £131.39m £134.08m £143.78m £163.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £2 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.08k £10.12k £4.62k £212.13k £790.24k
Income - Other £1.57m £998.81k £6.87m £2.02m £3.71m
Income - Legacies £118.42k £32.30k £33.17k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £135.57m £143.41m £141.63m £151.06m £166.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £93.99k £107.81k £107.84k £140.84k £314.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £47.01m £45.95m £46.84m £46.33m £66.79m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £100 £0 £0
Other assets £25.50m £29.25m £28.33m £24.51m £33.14m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.41m -£2.36m -£244.97k £0 £0
Total liabilities £19.69m £23.02m £21.51m £21.21m £46.34m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES SEALED 18 MARCH 1994 AND 23 JAN 1997
Charitable objects
FOR RELIEF OF THE AGED AND THE SICK IN SUCH MANNERS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 09 January 2001 : Standard registration
  • 09 February 2017 : Removed
  • 09 February 2017 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
The Orders Of St. John Care Trust
Eyre Court
Whisby Way
LINCOLN
LN6 3LQ
Phone:
0800 988 8133