THE SUSAN CHANNON BREAST CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to health professionals, such as Consultants,doctors, nurses and physiotherapists for travelling and studying best practices at centres of breast cancer excellence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 August 1995: Standard registration
- 02 November 2017: Funds received from 1060405 ROYAL VICTORIA INFIRMARY BREAST CANCER APPEAL
- SUSAN CHANNON BREAST CANCER TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry James Cain | Chair | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Channon ACIB | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH MARY O'DONOGHUE | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ANTHONY JOHN STEVENS ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOCTOR MIKE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.18k | £648 | £3.20k | £11.21k | £6.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.22k | £39.11k | £24.98k | £15.23k | £4.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JULY 1995 as amended on 05 Nov 2017 as amended on 13 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER AND/OR THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF THE CAUSES OF BREAST CANCER AND THE USEFUL DISSEMINATING INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC EITHER BY DIRECT GRANT TO OR REMUNERATION OF INDIVIDUALS ENGAGED IN SUCH STUDY WHO WORK IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND OR BY PAYMENT TO AN EXISTING OR FUTURE FUND, FOUNDATION, HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION, BODY OR TRUST ENGAGED IN SUCH STUDY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF TYNE AND WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Mitford Way
Dinnington
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE13 7LW
- Phone:
- 07773 767487
- Email:
- channonnigel@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window