Financial history ROUND HILL SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.52k £10.35k £6.95k £15.37k £10.13k
Total expenditure £7.74k £28.74k £9.02k £12.79k £3.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A