CHAPLAINCY TO THE UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS AND OTHER PERSONS CONNECTED TO THE UNIVERSITY, AND FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC, BY THE PROVISION OF CHAPLAINCY FACILITIES, INCLUDING A CHAPLAINCY CENTRE FOR THE UNIVERSITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF WORSHIP, PRAYER, PASTORAL WORK AND DISCUSSION ON AN ECUMENICAL BASIS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 August 1995: Standard registration
- THE GATEHOUSE (Working name)
- THE LEICESTER UNIVERSITY CHAPLAINCY LOCAL ECUMENICAL PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christopher John Rowan Willmott | Chair | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Edward Tiplady | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charles Midgley | Trustee | 04 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
THE VENERABLE RICHARD VERNON WORSFOLD | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Newton | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Heaps Perry | Trustee | 27 October 2002 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ROBERT IAN NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD LOUIS BRUCCIANI OBE DL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.41k | £24.78k | £19.41k | £24.56k | £36.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.75k | £26.64k | £22.65k | £29.98k | £31.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 9 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 04 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gatehouse
University Road
Leicester
LE1 7RH
- Phone:
- 01162856493
- Email:
- chaplaincy@le.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window