SAFETY GROUPS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Umbrella organisation covering all the local safety groups in the UK that are affiliated to RoSPA. RoSPA act as the secretariat. Mission - 'To promote health and safety by supporting a thriving national network of health and safety Groups'. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 August 1995: Standard registration
- SGUK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Foy | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sanjeev Kumar | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip John Jones | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Alan Ralph Gunn | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Edward Bibbings MBE | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Coombes | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Curry | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.07k | £3.82k | £2.50k | £4.03k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.63k | £12.12k | £5.65k | £8.80k | £4.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JAN 1991 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 1995 AS AMENDED ON 27 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2005 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND SAFETY BY PROVIDING GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT TO A NATIONAL NETWORK OF HEALTH AND SAFETY GROUPS IN PARTICULAR WE SEEK TO: I. HELP MAINTAIN AND GROW A NATIONAL NETWORK OF ACTIVE, ENGAGED HEALTH AND SAFETY GROUPS WHO PARTICIPATE IN RAISING HEALTH AND SAFETY ISSUES WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITIES AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT II. HELP TO MAINTAIN AND ESTABLISH ACCESSIBLE SAFETY GROUPS IN ALL PARTS OF THE UK AS WELL AS THE IOM AND CHANNEL ISLES III. HELP AND ENCOURAGE SAFETY GROUPS TO BE ACTIVE AND ENGAGED AT THE LEVEL OF THE BEST IV. TRY TO ENSURE SGUK IS RECOGNISED AS THE HUB OF THE SAFETY GROUPS MOVEMENT V. ACT AS AN AUTHORITATIVE AND RESPECTED PARTICIPANT IN THE HEALTH AND SAFETY SYSTEM VI. ASSIST GROUPS TO BE RECOGNISED BY SMES AS A FRIENDLY SOURCE OF HELP AND ADVICE ON A WIDE RANGE OF HEALTH AND SAFETY ISSUES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Safety Groups UK c/o RoSPA
Livingstone House
43 Discovery Terrace
Heriot-Watt Research Park
Edinburgh
EH14 4AP
- Phone:
- 0131 449 9378
- Email:
- treasurer@safetygroups.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window