BOLTON-LE-SANDS PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bolton Le Sands Preschool, Playgroup and Toddlers provide a caring and educational environment for children between the ages of 0 - 5 to to enable them to progress easily to school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 July 2023
Total income includes £110,366 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 August 1995: Standard registration
- BOLTON-LE-SANDS PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH CHARLOTTE RIX | Chair | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Donna Jackson | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Weed | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mapp | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Clare Park | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/07/2019 | 26/07/2020 | 26/07/2021 | 26/07/2022 | 26/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.47k | £133.19k | £148.85k | £159.19k | £197.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.14k | £139.30k | £143.22k | £151.94k | £188.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £100.84k | £10.07k | £98.59k | £110.37k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 26 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bolton Le Sands Pre School Centre
Packet Lane
Bolton Le Sands
CARNFORTH
Lancashire
LA5 8DW
- Phone:
- 01524824907
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window