ELWORTH PRE SCHOOL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ELWORTH PRE-SCHOOL GROUP SERVES THE LOCAL COMMUNITY PROVIDING QUALITY CHILD CARE AND EDUCATION FOR 2, 3 AND 4 YEAR OLDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £115,006 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 03 August 1995: Standard registration
- ELWORTH PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom van Enckevort | Chair | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Carruthers | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Morning | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Stubbs | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brittany Littlemore | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bailey | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bradley | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bayliss | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Bramhill | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.19k | £104.68k | £115.23k | £117.35k | £144.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.97k | £98.45k | £109.14k | £110.33k | £124.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £69.99k | £86.20k | £98.36k | £102.18k | £115.01k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peter's Church Hall
School Lane
Sandbach
Cheshire
Cheshire
CW11 3HU
- Phone:
- 01270761270
- Email:
- info@elworthpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window