Trustees ELWORTH PRE SCHOOL GROUP
Charity Number: 1048433

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom van Enckevort | Chair | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Carruthers | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Morning | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Stubbs | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brittany Littlemore | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bailey | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bradley | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bayliss | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Bramhill | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.