Financial history MARITIME VOLUNTEER SERVICE

Charity number: 1048454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £138.98k £116.63k £187.48k £227.05k £172.78k
Total expenditure £154.32k £113.32k £147.41k £215.42k £185.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.50k £5.90k £9.88k £9.98k