MARITIME VOLUNTEER SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity (MVS) trains its members in maritime, engineering, operations and communications skills. The MVS has a policy of positive social inclusion and around 30% of members are from the disadvantaged sectors of society. MVS members use their skills to support local and national authorities in times of major events, emergencies both real and exercised and in civil resilience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,977 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 August 1995: Standard registration
- MVS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Scorer | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Steven Howes | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward WOLTON | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Sparks | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
michelle oluyinka AKINTOYE | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DELLER | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander NUNNS | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Symons | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN RUSSELL SHARP | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Edward Spencer | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GLARE | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Hedley | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLIE EDWARD MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID EDWARD DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.98k | £116.63k | £187.48k | £227.05k | £172.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.32k | £113.32k | £147.41k | £215.42k | £185.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | £5.90k | £9.88k | £9.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/12/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 NOV 2016 as amended on 21 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF LIFE AND PROPERTY PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN THE MARITIME ENVIRONMENT. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF MARITIME AND COMMUNICATION SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maritime Volunteer Service
Dallam Court
Dallam Lane
Warrington
Cheshire
WA2 7LT
- Phone:
- 01925 563620
- Email:
- hq@mvs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window