Trustees MARITIME VOLUNTEER SERVICE
Charity number: 1048454

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Scorer | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Steven Howes | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward WOLTON | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Sparks | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
michelle oluyinka AKINTOYE | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DELLER | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander NUNNS | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Symons | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN RUSSELL SHARP | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Edward Spencer | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GLARE | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Hedley | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLIE EDWARD MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID EDWARD DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.