ILKESTON ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ilkeston round table raises charity money in aid of local groups/organisations within the Ilkeston DE7 area, we welcome anybody to apply for a donation, also help with charity fund raising is much appreciated, we also have a very eventful social calender for young men aged up to 45yrs old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 07 August 1995: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- ILKESTON AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £1.05k | £900 | £750 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.03k | £450 | £145 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 20 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIED, TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window