BESORO CHILD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Besoro Child Foundation provides support in Education and training to poor children in the village called BESORO in the Ashanti region of Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
- Ghana
Governance
- 09 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Adomako Basoah | Chair |
|
||||||
Yaw Basoah | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ama BASOAH | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr AFUA OKOROMEA BASOAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRACE BASOAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14k | £1.76k | £2.75k | £5.18k | £6.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70k | £42 | £5.83k | £4.97k | £5.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 20TH DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30TH APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO THE CHILDREN FROM THE VILLAGE CALLED BESORO IN GHANA TO ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP SKILLS WHICH MAY ASSIST THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WELL BEING IN ALL RESPECTS. (11)TO RELIEVE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY: (A)THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL FEES FOR THOSE STUDENTS WHO FIND THEMSELVES IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. (B)APPRENTICING POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, TO SOME USEFUL TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE BY OUTFITS, FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES OR OTHERWISE, AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION; AND (C)THE PROVISION OF PROJECTS TO PROVIDE AMONGST OTHER THINGS BASIC AMENITIES AND OTHER SERVICES TO THE BENEFICIAL AREA (NOT PROVIDED BY STATE AUTHORITITES).
Area of benefit
BESORO IN GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 TINDALE CLOSE
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 0RT
- Phone:
- 02087715691
- Email:
- CHARLESBASOAH@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window