WIRRAL CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the provision of facilities for the daily care, education and recreation of all children and particularly children under the age of 8 years of age, and promote observance of good standards of childminding by the parents of such children, and all persons and organisations providing such facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 August 1995: Standard registration
- 31 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 24 July 2018 | 389 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 26TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE,RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF ALL CHILDREN AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. B.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE,RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WIRRAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window