Trustees MORPETH MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1048490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachael Cabey Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Wendy Locks Trustee 25 July 2023
NORTHUMBERLAND ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Stephen Mark Locks Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Kathleen Anne Smith Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Kath Smith Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Allan Colver Trustee 20 June 2017
None on record
Dr Louise Jennet Freeman Trustee 21 May 2013
None on record
Colin Matthews Trustee 22 May 2001
None on record