THE NATURESAVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Natuesave Trust was formed to promote and encourage the protection, preservation and improvement of the environment for the benefit of the public, in particular by encouraging the greater adoption of sustainable development through the funding of specific environment and conservation projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 1995: Standard registration
- NATURESAVE TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Allen | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Moore | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Pitt | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.79k | £66.30k | £66.19k | £68.38k | £66.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.22k | £36.51k | £39.97k | £33.04k | £34.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/06/1995 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROTECTION PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING TOWARDS RESEARCH AND CONSERVATION PROJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NATURESAVE TRUST
SOUTH DEVON HOUSE
BABBAGE ROAD
TOTNES
DEVON
TQ9 5JA
- Phone:
- 01803864390
- Email:
- info@naturesavetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window