Financial history WARBOYS AND DISTRICT DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1048532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.31k £19.88k £19.13k £20.61k £25.00k
Total expenditure £20.77k £11.64k £21.85k £22.52k £26.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.03k £8.03k £8.20k N/A £8.71k