Accounts and annual returns CONQUEST SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1048535
Charity reporting is overdue by 1005 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 274 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 274 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 640 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 640 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1005 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1005 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 March 2021 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required