Financial history CHESS (CHILDREN'S HEALTH AND EDUCATION SECURED BY SPONSORSHIP)

Charity Number: 1048546
Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 28/02/2017
Total gross income £44.28k £38.21k £32.22k £18.93k £368
Total expenditure £47.58k £38.25k £32.16k £25.41k £5.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A