OLD CENTRALIANS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support to students of the Faculty of Engineering, Imperial College, London, who find themselves in financial difficulty through no fault of their own. To support the academic, sporting and social activities of the students in the Faculty of Engineering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 10 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN CHASE ACGI | Chair | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hon Kwan Allan Lee ACGI | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL WILLIAM LEHMANN ACGI | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL PATRICK CRESSWELL ACGI | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS LUMB ACGI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.52k | £80.12k | £81.58k | £86.05k | £57.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.45k | £52.10k | £33.15k | £67.68k | £97.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 24TH SEPTEMBER 1965. SCHEME OF 1ST JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
(A)THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO HAVING BECOME STUDENTS AT THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE WOULD BE UNABLE WITHOUT SUCH SCHOLARSHIPS OR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CONTINUE THEIR STUDIES AT THE COLLEGE (B)THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE STUDENTS, AND, IN SPECIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, MEMBERS OF THE ACADEMIC STAFF AT THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE TO PURSUE IN THEN UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE STUDIES WHICH ARE LIKELY TO BE OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE IN RELATION TO OR AS SUPPLEMENTARY TO THE WORK OF THE COLLEGE (C)THE SPONSORSHIP OF RESEARCH FOR STUDENTS OF THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT FOR POST-GRADUATE RESEARCH BY SUCH STUDENTS (D)THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES AND FACILITIES FOR STUDENTS OF THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE STUDENTS UNION KNOWN AS THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE UNION (E)THE PROCISION OF AMENITIES AND FACILITIES FOR STUDENTS OF THE IMPERIAL COLLEGE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY (OF WHICH THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE FORMS PART) THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE STUDENTS UNION KNOWN AS THE IMPERIAL COLLEGE UNION, BEING AMENITIES AND FACILITIES OF WHICH STUDENTS OF THE CITY AND GUILDS COLLEGE CAN SHARE (F)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CITY AND GUILD COLLEGE AND/OR THE OLD CENTRALIANS AS MAY BE APPROVED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE COMMITTEE OF THE OLD CENTRALIANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Westbourne Place
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 4GN
- Phone:
- 07740732344
- Email:
- cgca@imperial.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window