GLOBAL FUTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Futures supports research into work and family life, with a particular emphasis on the impact of new social trends on interpersonal relationships and informal bonds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ROY MULLAN | Chair |
|
||||||
GAVIN POYNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL BEN AMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15 | £3 | £1 | £31 | £94 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 17 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CONTEMPORARY PATTERNS OF GLOBAL AND LOCAL ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND POLITICAL DEVELOPMENT WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO COMPARATIVE STUDIES AND INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE FOLLOWING SUBJECTS NUMBERED (I) TO (III) AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (I) THE IMPACT OF DEMOGRAPHIC AND ECONOMIC CHANGES ON THE EXPERIENCES AND ATTITUDES OF PEOPLE IN RELATION TO THEIR WORK; (II) THE CHANGING ORGANISATION OF FAMILY LIFE DUE TO DEMOGRAPHIC AND ECONOMIC CHANGES WITH ATTENTION TO GENDER, YOUTH, THE AGEING POPULATION, FAMILY HEALTH CARE AND CHANGING MORAL PERCEPTIONS; (III) THE ROLE OF INSTITUTIONS FROM LOCAL TO INTERNATIONAL LEVEL IN POLICY FORMULATION IN RELATION TO DEMOGRAPHIC MOVEMENTS, FAMILY LIFE AND THE WORK PROCESS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 WOODSTOCK ROAD
LONDON
E17 4BH
- Phone:
- 02085277135
- Email:
- phil.mullan1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window