Accounts and annual returns ROLLERCOASTERS

Charity Number: 1048582
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2013 28 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 28 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 15 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 15 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 10 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 10 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 18 July 2010 On Time