Governing document FOWNHOPE RECREATION FIELD ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 30/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2014 as amended on 20 Mar 2019 as amended on 01 May 2018 as amended on 01 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF FOWNHOPE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELAXATION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, FOWNHOPE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.