BURGESS HILL SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music in all its aspects by the presentation of public concerts and recitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 August 1995: Standard registration
- BHSO (Working name)
- BURGESS HILL SINFONIETTA (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Tara La Roche Salter | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LIGHT | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Parsons | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Blythe | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise Foster | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.41k | £5.19k | £20.99k | £19.74k | £21.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.99k | £4.60k | £17.70k | £19.66k | £18.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 3RD NOVEMBER 1999 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,IMPROVE,DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED --IN PRACTICE BURGESS HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brookmeads
Roundwood Lane
Lindfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 1SJ
- Phone:
- 07702 150434
- Email:
- info@bhso.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window