GENESIS LEEDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Genesis offers confidential services to women involved in prostitution and young people experiencing or at risk of sexual exploitation. Through outreach, one to one work and drop-in sessions we provide advocacy, support and education with the aim of promoting women and young people's safety and rights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 August 1995: Standard registration
- 03 May 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.92k | £237.30k | £222.92k | £358.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.32k | £244.55k | £239.59k | £345.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 19 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 31 March 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 March 2005 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 March 2005 | 36 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
A.THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE WOMEN AND YOUNG GIRLS WHO ARE, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING INVOLVED IN PROSTITUTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICE, PASTORAL AND PRACTICAL CARE, AND B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ISSUES SURROUNDING WOMEN AND PROSTITUTION
Area of benefit
CITY OF LEEDS OR ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window