Accounts and annual returns ROYAL BATH AND WEST SHOW SPORTS FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 1048636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 August 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required