Governing document THE ART LIBRARIES SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND
Charity number: 1048642

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 1995, AS AMENDED 17 APRIL 1997, 8 FEBRUARY 2002, 8 JULY 2005 as amended on 30 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF ALL ASPECTS OF THE LIBRARIANSHIP OF THE VISUAL ARTS AND INCLUDING ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.