THE FRIENDS OF DITCHAM PARK SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VARIOUS SOCIAL EVENTS INCLUDING SCHOOL FAIRS, DANCES, QUIZ NIGHTS AND FASHION SHOWS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 August 1995: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF DITCHAM PARK SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tessa Jayne Hall | Chair | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Maria Gair | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Dennis | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Michelle Hitchens | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Beck | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Thomas | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Barker | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Brett | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anita Hockin | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Johnston | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Johnston | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Worrall | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.66k | £9.89k | £434 | £5.56k | £15.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.44k | £9.08k | £5.99k | £4.92k | £8.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT DITCHAM PARK SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, DITCHAM PARK SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DITCHAM PARK SCHOOL
DITCHAM
PETERSFIELD
GU31 5RN
- Phone:
- 01730825659
- Email:
- friendsditcham@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window