Financial history ICE FUTURES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1048724
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £194.20k £117.51k £101.70k £51.69k £60.08k
Total expenditure £74.53k £134.34k £237.37k £79.54k £175.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0