ICE FUTURES CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations provided to charities (mainly in the Inner London area) involved in the welfare and education of children and those with special needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 1995: Standard registration
- 05 February 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE IPE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.20k | £117.51k | £101.70k | £51.69k | £60.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.53k | £134.34k | £237.37k | £79.54k | £175.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 8TH AUG.1995 AS AMENDED ON 22 DECEMBER 2005 BY A CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (B) TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT,BY ALL APPROPRIATE MEANS INCLUDING MAKING GIFTS TO THEM EITHER OF MONEY OR OF OTHER THINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window