THE SUSSEX PET RESCUE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping small Sussex based animal charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 August 1995: Standard registration
- PET RESCUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catriona Mary Doggett | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Hamblin | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARCIA DIANA ANITA HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN TAPPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.90k | £446.23k | £150.59k | £111.36k | £243.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.45k | £166.39k | £193.35k | £298.67k | £418.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH OCTOBER 1994. AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10TH AUG.1995.
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING THE SUFFERING OF ABANDONED AND SICK ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITETHORNS
11 WHITETHORN DRIVE
BRIGHTON
BN1 5LH
- Phone:
- 01273551815
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window