THE TRAIDCRAFT EXCHANGE

Charity Number: 1048752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Traidcraft Exchange trading as Transform Trade are a global community of farmers, workers, collectives, campaigners, donors and supporters, we work together for trade that values people over profit. We partner with people who are fighting for their communities and finding better ways to trade. Wherever possible, the people who are directly experiencing injustice in trade lead our work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • Bangladesh
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 1995: Standard registration
  • 29 March 2022: Funds received from 1058376 WOOD GREEN MENNONITE CHURCH TRUST
  • 21 March 2024: Funds received from 1061955 WORLD IN EDUCATION FOR FAIR TRADE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Transform Trade (Working name)
  • TRAIDCRAFT (Previous name)
  • TRAIDCRAFT EXCHANGE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
France Villeneuve Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Adamson Richard Nsimba Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Anita Cheria Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
Karimi Kinoti Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Judith Kirton-Darling Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record
DAVID PAIN Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
Laurence Sewell Trustee 31 August 2018
HAMPTON FUEL ALLOTMENT
Received: On time
ONERICHMOND
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.09m £3.83m £4.24m £3.22m £3.38m
Total expenditure £3.37m £3.34m £3.54m £4.35m £3.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £97.00k £98.00k £198.00k £36.04k £238.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.24m £2.16m £2.25m £1.42m £1.88m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.85m £1.67m £1.99m £1.80m £1.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £205.00k £238.00k £576.00k £131.92k £328.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.70m £2.38m £2.79m £3.41m £3.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £679.00k £953.00k £753.00k £942.57k £856.53k
Expenditure - Governance £7.00k £32.00k £58.00k £89.77k £76.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £282.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £61.00k £43.00k £19.00k £14.86k £31.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.62m £2.60m £3.13m £1.99m £860.12k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £749.00k £1.29m £1.08m £1.07m £378.72k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 April 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 April 2024 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Traidcraft Exchange
Turners Building
7-15 Pink Lane
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 5DW
Phone:
01914976445