COLDEN PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide preschool childcare for children from 2.5 years old up to 4 years old. We provide sessional care and full day care. We also provide before and after school childcare in our children's club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 22 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Stansfield | Chair | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Thorpe | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Megan Whittaker | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Taylor | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE RILEY | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.27k | £75.03k | £81.09k | £95.27k | £67.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.26k | £85.88k | £90.33k | £94.11k | £62.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £38.84k | £26.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 258 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 October 2020 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 October 2020 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bracewell Hall
Blackshaw Head
HEBDEN BRIDGE
HX7 7JP
- Phone:
- 01422844971
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window