WATERGATE SCHOOL PSFA

Charity number: 1048796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PSFA engages in fund raising activities in support of Watergate School, a school for 110 children all with severe learning difficulties. Funds raised have been used for purchases of extra play and training equipment and for outings to places of interest. In recent years a soft play area and sensory garden have been funded by the PSFA as well as the replacement of one of our mini-buses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WATERGATE SCHOOL PSFA (Working name)
  • WATERGATE PARENTS,STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NATALIE CARROLL-WARD Chair 22 January 2016
None on record
CARLY KENNEDY Trustee 28 April 2017
None on record
LISA XAVIER Trustee 22 January 2016
None on record
JADE ANNE MARGARET JOYCE CODY Trustee 22 January 2016
None on record
HENRII STEPHANIE WEBB BA Trustee
RAVENSBOURNE PROJECT
Received: 54 days late

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 September 2024 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 September 2024 452 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 September 2024 817 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Melrose Close
London
SE12 0AL
Phone:
02086956555
Website:

No information available