THE PETER GOULD MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Peter Gould Music Trust promotes an annual programme of classical music concerts, usually at Theatr Mwldan in Cardigan, Ceredigion but occasionally at other nearby venues. The concert series features professional musicians including established performers of world-class and talented young musicians who are developing their skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 22 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Stanley Hewitt | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Clare Stevens | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JANE STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT EDMUND MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN JOHN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £140 | £140 | £4.01k | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £807 | £335 | £335 | £285 | £202 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 September 2023 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MARCH 1995 as amended on 06 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION IN AND THE APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND TO PROMOTE THOSE ARTS ESPECIALLY MUSIC THROUGH RECITALS CONCERTS THE PURCHASE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS PROVISION OF MASTER CLASSES AND TO HELP PEOPLE IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR STUDIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND TO FURTHER THE INTEREST AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN THE COMMUNITY PARTICULARLY IN WEST WALES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croesyforwyn Ganol
Eglwyswrw
CRYMYCH
Dyfed
SA41 3PR
- Phone:
- 01239891501
- Email:
- mrssphysics@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window