A.I.D.S. TRUST CYMRU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A service provider to those people both infected and affected by HIV and AIDS. 1. A day centre 2. Provides a range of complimentary therapies 3. Provides counselling 4. Provides information and advocacy 5. Provides 1-1 social and housing care 6. Provides educational sessions on raising awareness of sexually transmitted diseases in Comprehensive Schools in Wales, Youth Centres. 7. Pro
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 23 August 1995: Standard registration
- 25 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AIDS TRUST CYMRU (Working name)
- THE SWISH CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.24k | £224.04k | £235.04k | £238.45k | £225.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.34k | £255.07k | £246.03k | £236.33k | £233.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 19 August 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 1999 AND 10 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SOUTH AND WEST WALES WHO ARE INFECTED OR AFFECTED BY HIV AND/OR AIDS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING A) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING AND ADVICE SERVICES FOR PERSONS LIVING WITH HIV INFECTION AND THEIR PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND CARERS B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL NEED AMONGST SUCH PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION ASSISTANCE, GOODS AND SERVICES WHERE POSSIBLE C) TO ALLEVIATE LONELINESS AND ISOLATION OF SUCH PEOPLE D) TO PROMOTE THE SEXUAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF BOTH THOSE WHO ARE HIV POSITIVE AND THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF BECOMING SO.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AND WEST WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window