Accounts and annual returns NEW DIRECTIONS CAMDEN

Charity number: 1048830
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 February 2009 12 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 March 2008 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 12 February 2008 12 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 07 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 18 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 November 2004 On Time