MORLEY ELDERLY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the elderly to live independently at home. Advocacy, Advice, Access to a solicitor, Drop-in sessions, Gardening service, Lunch Clubs, Bingo Clubs, Community Tea Bar, Men's Group, Craft Group, Newsletters, Sign posting, Volunteering opportunities, Friendship Group, Singing Group, Memory Cafe, Carers Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £110,750 from 1 government contract(s) and £43,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 August 1995: Standard registration
- GREATER MORLEY COMMUNITY CARE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Madden | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Hamilton | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Smyth | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Twohey | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lynch | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY SIDGWICK | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS LEADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.52k | £206.83k | £198.14k | £187.28k | £177.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.10k | £168.00k | £161.48k | £205.33k | £168.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £110.75k | £154.25k | £110.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £106.64k | £194.78k | £43.50k | N/A | £43.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 11 JULY 1995 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY WITHIN THE GREATER MORLEY DISTRICT OF LEEDS IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
GREATER MORLEY DISTRICT OF LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MORLEY ELDERLY ACTION
32 WESLEY STREET
MORLEY
LEEDS
LS27 9ED
- Phone:
- 01132534484
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window