WIRRAL RAILWAY CIRCLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.the advancement of education 2.the advancement of the arts, culture, heritage or science
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 August 1995: Standard registration
- 02 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WIRRAL RAILWAY CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £429 | £380 | £610 | £375 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £271 | £373 | £881 | £435 | £161 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 14 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 12 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 07 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 16 November 2009 | 16 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 1971 AS AMENDED 16 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE PUBLIC INTEREST IN ALL OR ANY MATTERS RELATING TO RAILWAYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window