Accounts and annual returns STANLEY PARK INFANTS PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048861
Charity reporting is up to date (305 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 May 2025 305 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 May 2025 305 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 April 2025 670 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 April 2025 670 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 April 2025 1035 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 November 2020 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required