MUSTARD SEED CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1048903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Alongside selling Christian books, we run a cafe in which we offer a relaxed welcoming atmosphere where customers can talk together and with our staff and volunteers, some of whom have additional needs. We seek to support the elderly, disabled, vulnerable and homeless. We welcome secondary school pupils for work experience. Profits make grants to children and young peoples' organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £92,540
Total expenditure: £102,605

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 August 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE MUSTARD SEED (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Louise Ray Chair 20 October 2016
MUSTARD SEED CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Jayne Norton Trustee 05 September 2023
MUSTARD SEED CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Hannah Kathryn Boyd Trustee 11 July 2023
MUSTARD SEED CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Gareth John Stephens Trustee 11 July 2023
MUSTARD SEED CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Kieth Robert Sparks Trustee 28 January 2018
MUSTARD SEED CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £98.45k £84.04k £76.74k £81.33k £92.54k
Total expenditure £91.08k £32.69k £66.78k £93.50k £102.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £62.82k £16.08k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 All Saints Road
SIDMOUTH
EX10 8ER
Phone:
01395512225