Financial history THE LICHFIELD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1048904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £25.12k £9.29k £9.23k £15.19k £21.07k
Total expenditure £20.61k £8.20k £15.12k £19.63k £24.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A