Trustees THE LICHFIELD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1048904

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Jackson | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Libby Constance | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Jude Denny | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Elizabeth Fisher | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hilary Barnes | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Hodgkins | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Peter Emberson | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY THORPE | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.